Ms Rosslyn (Ros) Bates
Profile
Electorate:
Mudgeeraba - View Map(.pdf)
Party:
LNP
Election date:
21 Mar 2009
Speeches:
Inaugural (.pdf) |
All Speeches
Website:
http://www.rosbates.com.au/
Contact details
Electorate Office Address
Shop 1 & 2
2 Bell Place
MUDGEERABA QLD 4213
Phone: (07) 5601 7100
Fax: n/a
Email:
Mudgeeraba@parliament.qld.gov.au
Electorate Office Postal Address
PO Box 897
MUDGEERABA QLD 4213
Parliamentary Service
Current:
- Shadow Minister for Women: 15 Dec 2017
- Shadow Minister for Medical Research: 16 Nov 2020
- Shadow Minister for Health and Ambulance Services: 15 Dec 2017
Past:
- Shadow Minister for Communities, Women and Youth, Child Safety and the Prevention of Domestic and Family Violence and Shadow Minister for Disability Services and Seniors: 26 May 2016 - 14 Dec 2017
- Shadow Minister for Communities, Child Safety, Disabilities Services and the Prevention of Family and Domestic Violence: 10 May 2016 - 26 May 2016
- Deputy Opposition Whip: 22 Feb 2016 - 09 May 2016
- Member, Ethics Committee: 18 Feb 2016 - 10 May 2016
- Member, Health, Communities, Disability Services and Domestic and Family Violence Prevention Committee (formerly the Health and Ambulance Services Committee): 18 Feb 2016 - 10 May 2016
- Member, Health, Communities, Disability Services and Domestic and Family Violence Prevention Committee (formerly the Health and Ambulance Services Committee): 27 Mar 2015 - 18 Feb 2016
- Member, Health and Community Services Committee: 16 Apr 2013 - 06 Jan 2015
- Minister for Science, Information Technology, Innovation and the Arts: 03 Apr 2012 - 15 Feb 2013
- Member, Finance and Administration Committee: 16 June 2011 - 19 Feb 2012
- Shadow Minister for Government Services, Building Industry, Information and Communication Technology: 11 Apr 2011 - 19 Feb 2012
- Member, Social Development Committee: 23 Apr 2009 - 16 June 2011
Career
Career Summary:
Prior to election: Various clinical and administrative positions in Victoria (1981 – 1998)
General Manager, Wesley Gold Coast Hospital, Southport (1998 – 2001)
Clinical Science Associate, Genzyme Australasia, QLD, WA, NT and NZ (2001 – 2006)
Director, Government & Media Relations, Entrée Vous Pty Ltd (2006 – 2009)
Party Positions:
- (LNP) Member, Liberal National Party State Council, 2008
- (LNP) Chairman, Mudgeeraba State Electoral Council, 2008
- (LNP) Member, Liberal National Party (QLD Division) of the Federal Liberal Party, 2008
Official Awards:
- Prime Minister’s Centenary of Federation Medal for Services to the Australian Community in Health in 2001;
- Royal Australian College of Nursing Distinguished Nursing Services Award (QLD Division) in 2001;
- Queensland Telstra Business Woman of the Year Award (AusIndustry Category) in 2000.
Community Activity:
- (LNP) Member, Liberal National Party State Council, 2008
- (LNP) Chairman, Mudgeeraba State Electoral Council, 2008
- (LNP) Member, Liberal National Party (QLD Division) of the Federal Liberal Party, 2008
Personal
Birth Date:
25 May 1962 (Healesville, Victoria)
Education:
Mount Lilydale College, Lilydale, Victoria (1974 – 1978)
Diploma of Enrolled Nursing, Prince Henry’s Hospital, Melbourne (1980 – 1981)
Diploma of Nursing-Registered General Nurse, Box Hill Hospital, Box Hill, Victoria (1983 – 1986).