Hon Yvette D'Ath
Profile
Contact details
Ministerial Office Address
1 William Street
BRISBANE QLD 4000
Phone: (07) 3719 7400
Fax: n/a
Email:
attorney@ministerial.qld.gov.au
Ministerial Office Postal Address
GPO Box 149
BRISBANE QLD 4001
Electorate Office Address
Suite 35, Level 1
Bluewater Square Shopping Centre
Cnr Anzac Ave & Sutton Street
REDCLIFFE QLD 4020
Phone: (07) 3448 7100
Fax: n/a
Email:
Redcliffe@parliament.qld.gov.au
Electorate Office Postal Address
PO Box 936
REDCLIFFE QLD 4020
Electorate Office Postal Address
PO Box 198
Margate Beach Queensland 4019
Parliamentary Service
- Attorney-General and Minister for Justice and Minister for the Prevention of Domestic and Family Violence: 18 May 2023
- Chair, Business Committee: 27 Nov 2020 - 12 Feb 2024
- Member [Leader of the House], Committee of the Legislative Assembly: 26 Nov 2020 - 12 Feb 2024
- Minister for Health and Ambulance Services: 12 Nov 2020 - 17 May 2023
- Chair, Business Committee: 03 Sept 2018 - 06 Oct 2020
- Attorney-General and Minister for Justice: 12 Dec 2017 - 11 Nov 2020
- Leader of the House: 11 Dec 2017 - 12 Feb 2024
- Member, Committee of the Legislative Assembly: 11 Dec 2017 - 06 Oct 2020
- Attorney-General and Minister for Justice and Minister for Training and Skills: 16 Feb 2015 - 11 Dec 2017
- Member, Legal Affairs and Community Safety Committee: 27 Aug 2014 - 06 Jan 2015
- Shadow Minister for Justice and Attorney-General; Training; Disability Services; Housing: 05 Aug 2014 - 14 Feb 2015
- Member, Education and Innovation Committee: 04 Mar 2014 - 27 Aug 2014
- Shadow Minister for Education and Training; Disability Services; Science, IT and Innovation: 04 Mar 2014 - 04 Aug 2014
- Parliamentary Secretary for Climate Change, Innovation and Industry: 01 July 2013 - 18 Sept 2013
- Parliamentary Secretary for Climate Change, Industry and Innovation: 25 Mar 2013 - 01 July 2013
- Parliamentary Secretary for Climate Change and Energy Efficiency: 04 Feb 2013 - 25 Mar 2013
- Chair of Privileges and Members' Interests: 14 Mar 2012 - 05 Feb 2013
- Member, Speaker’s Panel: 20 Oct 2010 - 13 Feb 2013