Mr Jarrod Bleijie
Profile
Contact details
Opposition Office Address
Level 9, 63 George Street
BRISBANE QLD 4000
Phone: (07) 3838 6767
Fax: n/a
Email:
leader@opposition.qld.gov.au
Opposition Office Postal Address
PO Box 15057
CITY EAST QLD 4002
Electorate Office Address
Sunshine Central
Suite 4
3 Nicklin Way
MINYAMA QLD 4575
Phone: (07) 5406 3100
Fax: n/a
Email:
Kawana@parliament.qld.gov.au
Electorate Office Postal Address
PO Box 1200
BUDDINA QLD 4575
Parliamentary Service
- Member [Deputy Leader of the Opposition], Committee of the Legislative Assembly: 14 Mar 2022
- Deputy Leader of the Opposition: 14 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for Olympic and Paralympic Infrastructure and Jobs: 14 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for State Development, Infrastructure and Planning: 14 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for Industrial Relations: 15 Dec 2017
- Member, Business Committee: 27 Nov 2020 - 13 Mar 2022
- Member [Manager of Opposition Business], Committee of the Legislative Assembly: 24 Nov 2020 - 13 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for Finance: 16 Nov 2020 - 13 Mar 2022
- Member, Business Committee: 03 Sept 2018 - 06 Oct 2020
- Manager of Opposition Business: 15 Dec 2017 - 13 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for Education: 15 Dec 2017 - 15 Nov 2020
- Member, Committee of the Legislative Assembly: 15 Dec 2017 - 06 Oct 2020
- Shadow Minister for Employment, Industrial Relations, Skills and Training and Shadow Minister for Fair Trading: 10 May 2016 - 14 Dec 2017
- Shadow Minister for Police, Fire, Emergency Services and Corrective Services: 20 Feb 2015 - 10 May 2016
- Attorney-General and Minister for Justice: 03 Apr 2012 - 14 Feb 2015
- Member, Legal Affairs, Police, Corrective Services and Emergency Services Committee: 16 June 2011 - 19 Feb 2012
- Shadow Attorney-General: 29 Nov 2010 - 19 Feb 2012
- Shadow Minister for Justice and Corrective Services: 29 Nov 2010 - 11 Apr 2011
- Member, Law, Justice and Safety Committee (formerly the Legal, Constitutional and Administrative Review Committee): 23 Apr 2009 - 16 June 2011
- Member, Law, Justice and Safety Committee (formerly the Legal, Constitutional and Administrative Review Committee): 23 Apr 2009 - 28 May 2009