Mr John-Paul Langbroek
Profile
Electorate:
Surfers Paradise - View Map(.pdf)
Party:
LNP
Election date:
07 Feb 2004
Previous representation:
Surfers Paradise - (07 Feb 2004 - 08 Sept 2008)
Speeches:
Inaugural (.pdf) |
All Speeches
Website:
http://www.jplangbroek.com.au/
Contact details
Electorate Office Address
Suite 1, Level 1
Building 1, Capri on Via Roma
ISLE OF CAPRI QLD 4217
Phone: (07) 5600 2100
Fax: n/a
Email:
Surfers.Paradise@parliament.qld.gov.au
Electorate Office Postal Address
PO Box 80
ISLE OF CAPRI QLD 4217
Parliamentary Service
Current:
- Shadow Minister for Multiculturalism and Aboriginal and Torres Strait Islander Partnerships: 16 Nov 2020
- Shadow Minister for Seniors, Communities and Disability Services: 16 Nov 2020
Past:
- Shadow Minister for the 2032 Olympic and Paralympic Games Candidature: 13 Aug 2019 - 15 Nov 2020
- Shadow Minister for Sport and Racing and Shadow Minister for Multicultural Affairs: 15 Dec 2017 - 15 Nov 2020
- Shadow Minister for the Commonwealth Games: 15 Dec 2017 - 13 Aug 2019
- Shadow Minister for Health and Ambulance Services and Shadow Minister for the Commonwealth Games: 10 May 2016 - 14 Dec 2017
- Deputy Opposition Leader, Shadow Treasurer and Shadow Minister for Commonwealth Games: 20 Feb 2015 - 06 May 2016
- Minister for Science, Information Technology, Innovation and the Arts: 15 Feb 2013 - 20 Feb 2013
- Minister for Education, Training and Employment: 03 Apr 2012 - 14 Feb 2015
- Shadow Minister for Police, Corrective Services and Emergency Services: 11 Apr 2011 - 19 Feb 2012
- Shadow Minister for the Arts and Multicultural Affairs: 29 Nov 2010 - 11 Apr 2011
- Shadow Minister for the Arts: 06 Apr 2009 - 29 Nov 2010
- Leader of the Liberal National Party: 03 Apr 2009 - 22 Mar 2011
- Leader of the Opposition: 03 Apr 2009 - 22 Mar 2011
- Leader of Opposition Business: 30 Sept 2008 - 21 Mar 2009
- Shadow Minister for Education and Skills and Shadow Minister for the Arts: 12 Aug 2008 - 05 Apr 2009
- Shadow Minister for Health: 21 Sept 2006 - 12 Aug 2008
- Shadow Minister for Employment and Training: 08 Aug 2006 - 21 Sept 2006
- Shadow Minister for Racing: 28 Sept 2005 - 21 Sept 2006
- Shadow Minister for Public Works and Housing: 28 Sept 2005 - 08 Aug 2006
- Secretary, Parliamentary Liberal Party: 17 Feb 2004 - 12 Aug 2008
- Liberal Party Spokesperson for Education and the Arts, Police and Corrective Services, Public Works, Housing and Racing, and Natural Resources, Mines and Energy: 17 Feb 2004 - 27 Sept 2005
Personal
Birth Date:
31 Jan 1961
Family:
Married to Stacey (3 children)