Ms Fiona Simpson
Profile
Electorate:
Maroochydore - View Map(.pdf)
Party:
LNP
Election date:
19 Sept 1992
Previous representation:
Maroochydore - (19 Sept 1992 - 08 Sept 2008)
Speeches:
Inaugural (.pdf) |
All Speeches
Website:
http://www.fionasimpson.com.au/
Contact details
Electorate Office Address
Tenancy 1b
148 Horton Parade
MAROOCHYDORE QLD 4558
Phone: (07) 5406 7100
Fax: n/a
Email:
Maroochydore@parliament.qld.gov.au
Parliamentary Service
Current:
- Shadow Minister for Finance and Better Regulation: 14 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for Integrity in Government: 16 Nov 2020
Past:
- Shadow Minister for Olympic and Paralympic Infrastructure and Jobs: 11 Oct 2021 - 13 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for State Development, Infrastructure and Planning: 16 Nov 2020 - 13 Mar 2022
- Shadow Minister for Employment and Small Business: 15 Dec 2017 - 15 Nov 2020
- Shadow Minister for Training and Skills Development: 15 Dec 2017 - 15 Nov 2020
- Shadow Minister for Aboriginal and Torres Strait Islander Partnerships and Multicultural Affairs: 10 May 2016 - 14 Feb 2017
- Shadow Minister for Local Government and Main Roads, Community Recovery and Resilience: 23 Mar 2015 - 10 May 2016
- Speaker of the Legislative Assembly: 15 May 2012 - 23 Mar 2015
- Shadow Minister for Waste Watch, Shadow Minister for Community Services and Housing and Shadow Minister for Women: 11 Apr 2011 - 19 Feb 2012
- Shadow Minister for Road Safety: 29 Nov 2010 - 11 Apr 2011
- Shadow Minister for Transport and Main Roads: 06 Apr 2009 - 11 Apr 2011
- Shadow Minister for Infrastructure (including ICT) and Shadow Minister for Main Roads and Transport: 12 Aug 2008 - 05 Apr 2009
- Shadow Minister for Infrastructure and Planning: 17 Sept 2007 - 12 Aug 2008
- Shadow Minister for Tourism: 17 Sept 2007 - 29 Jan 2008
- Shadow Minister for State Development, Employment, Industrial Relations and Shadow Minister for Small Business and Tourism: 16 Apr 2007 - 17 Sept 2007
- Shadow Minister for Industrial Relations: 30 Jan 2007 - 16 Apr 2007
- Shadow Minister for Small Business and Employment: 30 Jan 2007 - 16 Apr 2007
- Deputy Leader of the Opposition: 21 Sept 2006 - 28 July 2008
- Shadow Minister for State Development: 21 Sept 2006 - 16 Apr 2007
- Shadow Minister for Employment and Industrial Relations: 21 Sept 2006 - 30 Jan 2007
- Shadow Minister for Infrastructure: 21 Sept 2006 - 30 Jan 2007
- Deputy Leader of The Nationals: 18 Sept 2006 - 28 July 2008
- Shadow Minister for Transport and Main Roads: 08 Aug 2006 - 21 Sept 2006
- Shadow Minister for Industrial Relations: 01 July 2006 - 08 Aug 2006
- Shadow Minister for Women's Policy: 28 Sept 2005 - 21 Sept 2006
- Shadow Minister for State Development, Shadow Minister for Small Business, Information Technology and Innovation: 28 Sept 2005 - 08 Aug 2006
- Shadow Minister for Transport and Main Roads and Shadow Minister for Urban Affairs: 08 Mar 2004 - 27 Sept 2005
- Shadow Minister for Tourism: 12 Mar 2001 - 22 Apr 2003
- Shadow Minister for Women's Policy: 02 July 1998 - 27 Sept 2005
- Shadow Minister for Health: 02 July 1998 - 08 Mar 2004
- Secretary to the Parliamentary National Party: 17 Feb 1998 - 27 July 1998
- Temporary Chairman of Committees: 02 Apr 1996 - 19 May 1998
- Temporary Chairman of Committees: 05 Nov 1992 - 20 June 1995
Personal
Birth Date:
18 Apr 1965